+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On May 1, 2014 in the House:
- Effective Date
On April 29, 2014 in the House:
- Act 652
- House Date Signed by Governor
On March 25, 2014 in the House:
- House Sent to Governor
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed/Adopted
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported
On March 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On March 10, 2014 in the House:
- House Passed/Adopted
- House Third Readers
- House Committee Favorably Reported
On March 7, 2014 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- House First Readers
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- House Hopper
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor