+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On April 28, 2016 in the House:
- Effective Date
- Act 504
- House Date Signed by Governor
On March 29, 2016 in the House:
- House Sent to Governor
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed/Adopted
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- House Passed/Adopted
- House Third Readers
- House Committee Favorably Reported
On March 7, 2016 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- House First Readers
On February 29, 2016 in the House:
- House Hopper
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor