+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 8, 2018 in the House:
- Effective Date
- Act 530
- House Date Signed by Governor
On April 3, 2018 in the House:
- House Sent to Governor
On March 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed/Adopted
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported
On March 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On March 23, 2018 in the House:
- House Immediately Transmitted to Senate
- House Passed/Adopted
- House Third Readers
- House Committee Favorably Reported
On March 21, 2018 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On March 19, 2018 in the House:
- House First Readers
- House Hopper
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor