+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (10)
+ − Actions (19)
On July 1, 2015 in the House:
- Effective Date
On May 12, 2015 in the House:
- Act 301
- House Date Signed by Governor
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- House Sent to Governor
On April 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub As Amended
On March 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
- Senate Third Read
On March 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On March 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Recommitted
On March 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
On March 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On March 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On March 9, 2015 in the House:
- House Passed/Adopted By Substitute
- House Third Readers
On March 4, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On January 29, 2015 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On January 28, 2015 in the House:
- House First Readers
On January 27, 2015 in the House:
- House Hopper