+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On May 3, 2016 in the House:
- Effective Date
- Act 562
- House Date Signed by Governor
On March 28, 2016 in the House:
- House Sent to Governor
On March 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed/Adopted
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported
On February 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On February 23, 2016 in the House:
- House Passed/Adopted
- House Third Readers
- House Committee Favorably Reported
On February 22, 2016 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On February 19, 2016 in the House:
- House First Readers
On February 18, 2016 in the House:
- House Hopper