+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On March 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On March 15, 2018 in the House:
- House Passed/Adopted
- House Third Readers
- House Committee Favorably Reported
On March 14, 2018 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On March 12, 2018 in the House:
- House First Readers
On March 9, 2018 in the House:
- House Hopper
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor