+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On March 22, 2018 in the House:
- Effective Date
- Act 290
- House Date Signed by Governor
On March 21, 2018 in the House:
- House Sent to Governor
On March 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed/Adopted
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported
On March 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On March 14, 2018 in the House:
- House Immediately Transmitted to Senate
- House Passed/Adopted
- House Third Readers
- House Committee Favorably Reported
On March 12, 2018 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On March 9, 2018 in the House:
- House First Readers
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- House Hopper