+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On July 1, 2016 in the House:
- Effective Date
On May 3, 2016 in the House:
- Act 555
- House Date Signed by Governor
On March 30, 2016 in the House:
- House Sent to Governor
On March 24, 2016 in the House:
- House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub
On March 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
- Senate Third Read
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On February 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On February 23, 2016 in the House:
- House Passed/Adopted
- House Third Readers
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- House Committee Favorably Reported
- House Second Readers
On February 16, 2016 in the House:
- House First Readers
- House Hopper