+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 28, 2022 in the House:
- Effective Date
On May 2, 2022 in the House:
- Act 756
- House Date Signed by Governor
On April 6, 2022 in the House:
- House Sent to Governor
On March 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed/Adopted
- Senate Third Read
On March 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
On March 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported
On February 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On February 15, 2022 in the House:
- House Passed/Adopted
- House Third Readers
On February 10, 2022 in the House:
- House Committee Favorably Reported
On February 1, 2022 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On January 27, 2022 in the House:
- House First Readers
On January 26, 2022 in the House:
- House Hopper
+ − Votes (2)
March 23, 2022: Senate Vote #705 PASSAGE
- Yeas: 48
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 4
February 15, 2022: House Vote #522 PASSAGE
- Yeas: 153
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 10
- Absent: 15