+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On February 17, 2022 in the House:
- Effective Date
- Act 352
- House Date Signed by Governor
On February 15, 2022 in the House:
- House Sent to Governor
On February 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Transmitted House
- Senate Passed/Adopted
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported
On February 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On February 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- House Immediately Transmitted to Senate
On February 2, 2022 in the House:
- House Passed/Adopted
- House Third Readers
- House Committee Favorably Reported
On February 1, 2022 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On January 27, 2022 in the House:
- House First Readers
On January 26, 2022 in the House:
- House Hopper
+ − Votes (2)
February 8, 2022: Senate Vote #480 LOCAL CONSENT CALENDAR
- Yeas: 47
- Present/NV: 6
- Absent: 3
February 2, 2022: House Vote #471 Local Calendar
- Yeas: 115
- Nays: 46
- Present/NV: 6
- Absent: 13
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor