+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On May 8, 2018 in the House:
- Effective Date
- Act 502
- House Date Signed by Governor
On April 4, 2018 in the House:
- House Sent to Governor
On March 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed/Adopted
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported
On March 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On March 15, 2018 in the House:
- House Passed/Adopted
- House Third Readers
- House Committee Favorably Reported
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- House First Readers
On February 26, 2018 in the House:
- House Hopper
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor