+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On August 3, 2020 in the House:
- Act 555
- House Date Signed by Governor
On June 29, 2020 in the House:
- House Sent to Governor
On June 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed/Adopted
- Senate Third Read
- Senate Taken from Table
- Senate Third Read Tabled
On June 19, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
On June 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported
On March 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On March 9, 2020 in the House:
- House Passed/Adopted
- House Third Readers
On March 4, 2020 in the House:
- House Committee Favorably Reported
On February 26, 2020 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On February 25, 2020 in the House:
- House First Readers
On February 24, 2020 in the House:
- House Hopper