+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On April 12, 1999 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0930)
On March 29, 1999 in the House:
- Bill became law, Chapter 930 (effective 7/1/99)
- Bill returned without Governor's signature
On March 3, 1999 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 1, 1999 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On February 27, 1999 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1529ER)
On February 18, 1999 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 17, 1999 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 1999 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules (16-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 1999 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 9, 1999 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Passed House (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 8, 1999 in the House:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N)
On January 13, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/07/99 995072323