+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (25)
On April 20, 1998 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0420)
On April 12, 1998 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 420 (effective 7/1/98)
On April 2, 1998 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 31, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 31, 1998 in the House:
- Enrolled
On March 16, 1998 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB657ER)
On March 5, 1998 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On March 4, 1998 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (39-Y 0-N)
On March 3, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 1998 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 4, 1998 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (98-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 1998 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 985977208-E
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read second time
On February 2, 1998 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 30, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Agriculture w/amendment (23-Y 1-N)
On January 22, 1998 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
- Presented & ordered printed 985977208
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
March 5, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
March 4, 1998: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
March 3, 1998: Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N)
February 4, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
January 30, 1998: Reported from Agriculture w/amendment (23-Y 1-N)
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor