+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On May 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Died in Finance and Tax
On March 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Now in Finance and Tax
- Favorable by Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; YEAS 4 NAYS 0
On March 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security, 03/10/15, 1:30 pm, 37 Senate Office Building
On March 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; Finance and Tax; Appropriations
On February 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Statute Amended
- Article VII - Section 6
+ − Vote
May 29, 2015: Floor vote: S 0910 Filed
- Yeas: 4
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor