+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On May 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Died in Judiciary
- Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Now in Judiciary
- Introduced
On March 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Favorable by Criminal Justice; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
On February 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 03/06/17, 1:30 pm, 37 Senate Office Building
On January 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Criminal Justice; Judiciary; Rules
On January 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Statute Amended
- Article IV - Section 8
+ − Vote
October 10, 2017: Floor vote: S 270 Filed
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor