+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On April 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Died in Judiciary, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HR 145 (Adopted)
On March 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability read 1st time
- Introduced
On January 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Now in Judiciary
On January 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
- CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 4 NAYS 2
On January 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 01/27/21, 9:00 am, 37 Senate Building
On December 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Judiciary; Rules
On December 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Amendment
127248 - Amendment (Replaced by Committee Substitute 1/27/2021)
Delete line 43 and insert:
+ − Vote
July 22, 2021: Floor vote: S 150 Filed
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor