+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On April 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7059 (Ch. 2019-34)
- Substituted HB 7059
- Read 2nd time
On April 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/29/19
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
On April 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 16 NAYS 1
On April 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/23/19, 2:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
On March 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Now in Rules
- Favorable by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 03/12/19, 1:30 pm, 301 Senate Building
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On February 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules
On February 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed
On February 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Submitted as Committee Bill and Reported Favorably by Criminal Justice; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
On February 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 02/19/19, 10:00 am, 37 Senate Building
On February 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Submitted for consideration by Criminal Justice
+ − Analyses (6)
+ − Statute Amended
- 790.0601 - Public records exemption for concealed weapons.
+ − Votes (3)
July 18, 2019: Floor vote: S 7044 pb
- Yeas: 5
July 18, 2019: Floor vote: S 7044 Filed
- Yeas: 5
July 18, 2019: Floor vote: S 7044 Filed
- Yeas: 16
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsor
Criminal Justice
Type:
Primary Sponsor