+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7053 (Ch. 2016-238)
On February 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Retained on Calendar
On February 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- CS by Appropriations read 1st time
On February 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/10/16
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
- Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On February 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 18 NAYS 0
On January 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/03/16, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
On January 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Now in Appropriations
On January 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee Recommendation: CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
On January 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On January 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services, 01/13/16, 1:30 pm, 401 Senate Office Building
On December 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations
On November 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed
On November 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 11/19/15, 9:00 am, 301 Senate Office Building -- Submitted as Committee Bill; YEAS 4 NAYS 0
- Submitted for consideration by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
+ − Analyses (6)
+ − Amendments (2)
882374 - Amendment (Delete All)
Delete everything after the enacting clause and insert:
448330 - Amendment (Delete All)
Delete everything after the enacting clause and insert:
+ − Statutes Amended (13)
- 383.141 - Prenatally diagnosed conditions; patient to be provided information; definitions; information clearinghouse; advisory council.
- 391.025 - Applicability and scope.
- 391.026 - Powers and duties of the department.
- 391.301 - Developmental evaluation and intervention programs; legislative findings and intent.
- 391.302 - Definitions.
- 391.303 - Program requirements.
- 391.304 - Program coordination.
- 391.305 - Program standards.
- 391.306 - Program funding; contracts.
- 391.307 - Program review.
- 391.308 - Infants and Toddlers Early Intervention Program.
- 413.092 - Blind Babies Program.
- 1003.575 - Assistive technology devices; findings; interagency agreements.
+ − Votes (3)
October 10, 2017: Floor vote: S 7034 pb
- Yeas: 4
October 10, 2017: Floor vote: S 7034 Filed
- Yeas: 6
October 10, 2017: Floor vote: S 7034 Filed
- Yeas: 18
+ − Sponsor
Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
Type:
Primary Sponsor