+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On January 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7035 (Ch. 2016-28)
- Substituted HB 7035
- Read 2nd time
On January 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 01/28/16
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
On January 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 13 NAYS 0
On January 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Rules, 01/20/16, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building
On January 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Now in Rules
- Introduced
On January 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Favorable by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
On January 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 01/11/16, 4:00 pm, 401 Senate Office Building
On December 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules
On November 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed
On November 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 11/17/15, 1:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building -- Submitted as Committee Bill; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
- Submitted for consideration by Banking and Insurance
+ − Analyses (6)
+ − Statute Amended
- 119.0712 - Executive branch agency-specific exemptions from inspection or copying of public records.
+ − Votes (3)
October 10, 2017: Floor vote: S 7032 pb
- Yeas: 9
October 10, 2017: Floor vote: S 7032 Filed
- Yeas: 5
October 10, 2017: Floor vote: S 7032 Filed
- Yeas: 13
+ − Sponsor
Banking and Insurance
Type:
Primary Sponsor