+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On May 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Died in Appropriations
On March 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Now in Appropriations
- Favorable by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
On March 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 03/17/15, 9:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building
On March 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On February 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Banking and Insurance; Appropriations
On February 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed
On February 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 02/17/15, 10:00 am, 401 Senate Office Building -- Submitted as Committee Bill; YEAS 4 NAYS 0
- Submitted for consideration by Governmental Oversight and Accountability
+ − Amendments (2)
496174 - Amendment
Delete line 22 and insert:
507284 - Amendment
Delete lines 26 - 27 and insert:
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Votes (2)
May 29, 2015: Floor vote: S 7026 pb
- Yeas: 4
May 29, 2015: Floor vote: S 7026 Filed
- Yeas: 10
+ − Sponsor
Governmental Oversight and Accountability
Type:
Primary Sponsor