+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (19)
On March 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7095 (Ch. 2018-120)
- Substituted HB 7095
- Read 2nd time
On March 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/07/18
On March 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- CS by Rules read 1st time
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
- Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- CS by- Rules; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Rules, 03/01/18, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
On February 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/26/18, 2:30 pm, 412 Knott Building --Not Considered
On January 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Now in Rules
On January 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Favorable by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
On January 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On January 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 01/10/18, 9:00 am, 401 Senate Office Building
On December 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules
On November 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Filed
On November 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Submitted as Committee Bill and Reported Favorably by Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
On November 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities, 11/14/17, 2:00 pm, 301 Senate Office Building
- Submitted for consideration by Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities
+ − Analyses (6)
+ − Amendments (2)
263700 - Substitute Amendment (Delete All) (417470)
Delete everything after the enacting clause and insert:
417470 - Amendment
Delete line 28 and insert:
+ − Statute Amended
- 119.0713 - Local government agency exemptions from inspection or copying of public records.
+ − Votes (3)
May 3, 2018: Floor vote: S 7008 pb
- Yeas: 7
May 3, 2018: Floor vote: S 7008 Filed
- Yeas: 6
May 3, 2018: Floor vote: S 7008 Filed
- Yeas: 12
+ − Sponsor
Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities
Type:
Primary Sponsor