+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7013 (Ch. 2018-75)
- Substituted HB 7013
- Read 2nd time
On February 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/28/18
On January 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
- Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 13 NAYS 0
On January 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Rules, 01/18/18, 1:30 pm, 110 Senate Office Building
On January 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On December 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Now in Rules
- Favorable by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
On November 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 12/05/17, 10:00 am, 401 Senate Office Building
On November 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules
On October 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Filed
On October 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Submitted as Committee Bill and Reported Favorably by Judiciary; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
On October 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 10/24/17, 3:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building
- Submitted for consideration by Judiciary
+ − Analyses (6)
+ − Statute Amended
- 68.083 - Civil actions for false claims.
+ − Votes (3)
May 3, 2018: Floor vote: S 7006 pb
- Yeas: 6
May 3, 2018: Floor vote: S 7006 Filed
- Yeas: 7
May 3, 2018: Floor vote: S 7006 Filed
- Yeas: 13
+ − Sponsor
Judiciary
Type:
Primary Sponsor