+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On February 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- Chapter No. 2022-8
On February 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor
On February 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
On February 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Ordered enrolled
On February 2, 2022 in the House:
- Passed; YEAS 116, NAYS 0
- Read 3rd time
On February 1, 2022 in the House:
- Added to Third Reading Calendar
- Placed on 3rd reading
- Read 2nd time
- Substituted for HB 7007
On January 27, 2022 in the House:
- 1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
- Bill added to Special Order Calendar (2/1/2022)
- Bill referred to House Calendar
On January 19, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read 3rd time
- Read 2nd time
- Immediately certified
- Passed; YEAS 35 NAYS 0
On January 19, 2022 in the House:
- In Messages
On January 13, 2022 in the Senate:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 01/19/22
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
- Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 15 NAYS 0
On January 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On January 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Rules, 01/13/22, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
On November 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
On November 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Submitted as Committee Bill and Reported Favorably by Health Policy; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
On October 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 11/03/21, 11:30 am, 412 Knott Building
- Submitted for consideration by Health Policy
+ − Analyses (4)
+ − Statute Amended
- 382.008 - Death, fetal death, and nonviable birth registration.
+ − Votes (4)
July 19, 2022: Floor vote: S 7000 pb
- Yeas: 10
July 19, 2022: Floor vote: S 7000 Filed
- Yeas: 15
February 2, 2022: Floor vote: S 7000 Filed
- Yeas: 116
January 19, 2022: Floor vote: S 7000 Filed
- Yeas: 35
+ − Sponsor
Health Policy
Type:
Primary Sponsor