+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (37)
On April 29, 2021 in the House:
- Message sent to senate
- Passed as amended; YEAS 77, NAYS 38
- Concurred in Senate amendment(s) to House amendment(s)
- Amendment 811008 Concur
- Added to Senate Message List
- In Messages
On April 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed as amended; YEAS 23 NAYS 17
- Concurred in House amendment(s) as amended (942955)
- Amendment(s) to House amendment(s) adopted (811008)
- Ordered engrossed, then enrolled
On April 28, 2021 in the House:
- Read 3rd time
- Message sent to senate
- Passed as amended; YEAS 78, NAYS 41
On April 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- In returning messages
On April 27, 2021 in the House:
- Added to Third Reading Calendar
- Placed on 3rd reading
- Amendment 942955 adopted
- Read 2nd time
On April 26, 2021 in the House:
- In Messages
On April 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read 3rd time
- Passed; YEAS 22 NAYS 17
On April 26, 2021 in the House:
- Amendment 942955 filed
- Bill referred to House Calendar
- Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/27/2021)
- 1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
On April 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on 3rd reading
- Read 2nd time
On April 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/22/21
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
On April 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Favorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 10 NAYS 9
On April 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/19/21, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building
On April 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced
- Referred to Appropriations
On April 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed
On April 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Submitted as Committee Bill and Reported Favorably by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 3 NAYS 2
On April 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 04/06/21, 4:00 pm, 37 Senate Building
- Submitted for consideration by Governmental Oversight and Accountability
+ − Analyses (5)
+ − Amendments (6)
828884 - Amendment (Favorable 4/6/2021)
Delete lines 388 - 392 and insert:
942955 - Strike All Amendment (Senate: Concurred as Amended 4/29/2021)
Remove everything after the enacting clause and insert:
374338 - S Amend. to H Amend. (942955) (Senate: Withdrawn 4/29/2021)
Between lines 68 and 69 insert:
242480 - S Amend. to H Amend. (942955) (Senate: Withdrawn 4/29/2021)
Between lines 68 and 69 insert:
165084 - S Amend. to H Amend. (942955) (Senate: Withdrawn 4/29/2021)
Delete lines 406 - 407 and insert:
811008 - S Amend. to H Amend. (942955) (House: Concur 4/29/2021)
Delete lines 411 - 412 and insert:
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
+ − Votes (6)
April 30, 2021: Floor vote: S 7072 pb
- Yeas: 3
- Nays: 2
April 30, 2021: Floor vote: S 7072 Filed
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 9
April 29, 2021: Floor vote: S 7072 Filed
- Yeas: 77
- Nays: 38
April 29, 2021: Floor vote: S 7072 Filed
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 17
April 28, 2021: Floor vote: S 7072 Filed
- Yeas: 78
- Nays: 41
April 26, 2021: Floor vote: S 7072 Filed
- Yeas: 22
- Nays: 17
+ − Sponsors (2)
Governmental Oversight and Accountability
Type:
Primary Sponsor