+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On March 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7099 (Ch. 2016-220)
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 03/03/16, 8:00 am, 412 Knott Building --Not Considered
On February 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced
- Referred to Appropriations
On February 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Filed
On February 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Finance and Tax, 02/08/16, 4:00 pm, 401 Senate Office Building -- Submitted as Committee Bill; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
- Submitted for consideration by Finance and Tax
+ − Analyses (3)
+ − Statutes Amended (6)
+ − Vote
October 10, 2017: Floor vote: S 7064 pb
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsor
Finance and Tax
Type:
Primary Sponsor