+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (6)
On March 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On March 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
On March 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Submitted as Committee Bill and Reported Favorably by Appropriations; YEAS 14 NAYS 5
On March 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 03/04/21, 11:30 am, 412 Knott Building
- Submitted for consideration by Appropriations
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Statute Amended
- 1010.88 -
+ − Vote
April 28, 2021: Floor vote: S 7052 pb
- Yeas: 14
- Nays: 5
+ − Sponsor
Appropriations
Type:
Primary Sponsor