+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On February 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5005 (Ch. 2016-63), HB 5001 (Ch. 2016-66)
- Substituted HB 5005
- Read 3rd time
On February 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on 3rd reading
- Read 2nd time
On February 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/10/16
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
On February 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Favorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 19 NAYS 0
On January 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/03/16, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
On January 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On January 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Appropriations
On January 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Filed
On January 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 01/11/16, 4:00 pm, 401 Senate Office Building -- Submitted as Committee Bill; YEAS 4 NAYS 0
- Submitted for consideration by Governmental Oversight and Accountability
+ − Analyses (4)
+ − Amendment
319448 - Amendment
Before line 14 insert:
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
+ − Votes (2)
October 10, 2017: Floor vote: S 7042 pb
- Yeas: 4
October 10, 2017: Floor vote: S 7042 Filed
- Yeas: 19
+ − Sponsor
Governmental Oversight and Accountability
Type:
Primary Sponsor