+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (30)
On April 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Chapter No. 2019-16
On April 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor
On April 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
On April 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ordered enrolled
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- Passed; YEAS 116 NAYS 0
- Read 3rd time
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on 3rd reading
- Read 2nd time
- Substituted for HB 7037
On April 4, 2019 in the House:
- Received
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/10/19
- Referred to Calendar
- In Messages
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0
- Read 3rd time
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on 3rd reading
- Read 2nd time
On March 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/27/19
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
- Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
On March 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Rules, 03/13/19, 10:00 am, 110 Senate Building
On March 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Now in Rules
- Favorable by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 4 NAYS 0
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On March 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 03/06/19, 10:30 am, 301 Senate Building
On February 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules
On February 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed
On February 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Submitted as Committee Bill and Reported Favorably by Infrastructure and Security; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
On February 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Infrastructure and Security, 02/13/19, 1:30 pm, 110 Senate Building
- Submitted for consideration by Infrastructure and Security
+ − Analyses (6)
+ − Statute Amended
- 316.0777 - Automated license plate recognition systems; public records exemption.
+ − Votes (5)
July 18, 2019: Floor vote: S 7034 pb
- Yeas: 7
July 18, 2019: Floor vote: S 7034 Filed
- Yeas: 4
July 18, 2019: Floor vote: S 7034 Filed
- Yeas: 17
April 11, 2019: Floor vote: S 7034 Filed
- Yeas: 116
April 3, 2019: Floor vote: S 7034 Filed
- Yeas: 39
+ − Sponsor
Infrastructure and Security
Type:
Primary Sponsor