+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (33)
On May 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Chapter No. 2015-31, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1001 (Ch. 2015-126)
On May 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor
On May 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
On April 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ordered enrolled
On April 24, 2015 in the House:
- CS passed; YEAS 117 NAYS 0
- Read 3rd time
On April 23, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on 3rd reading
- Read 2nd time
- Substituted for CS/CS/HB 293
On April 22, 2015 in the House:
- Received
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/23/15
- Referred to Calendar
- In Messages
On April 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- CS passed as amended; YEAS 40 NAYS 0
- Read 3rd time
On April 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read 2nd time
- Ordered engrossed
- Amendment(s) adopted (253522)
- Placed on 3rd reading
On April 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- CS by Appropriations read 1st time
On April 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/14/15
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
- Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On April 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
On April 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/09/15, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
On March 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Now in Appropriations
On March 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee Recommendation: CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
On March 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services, 03/11/15, 9:00 am, 401 Senate Office Building
On March 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On February 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations
On February 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed
On January 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 02/05/15, 9:00 am, 301 Senate Office Building -- Submitted as Committee Bill; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
- Submitted for consideration by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
+ − Amendments (3)
253522 - Amendment
Delete line 1375 and insert:
172204 - Amendment
Delete lines 442 - 443 and insert:
370484 - Amendment (Delete All)
Delete everything after the enacting clause and insert:
+ − Statutes Amended (41)
- 20.41 - Department of Elderly Affairs.
- 400.0060 - Definitions.
- 400.0061 - Legislative findings and intent; long-term care facilities.
- 400.0063 - Establishment of Office of State Long-Term Care Ombudsman; designation of ombudsman and legal advocate.
- 400.0065 - State Long-Term Care Ombudsman; duties and responsibilities.
- 400.0067 - State Long-Term Care Ombudsman Council; duties; membership.
- 400.0069 - Local long-term care ombudsman councils; duties; membership.
- 400.0070 - Conflicts of interest.
- 400.0071 - State Long-Term Care Ombudsman Program complaint procedures.
- 400.0073 - State and local ombudsman council investigations.
- 400.0074 - Local ombudsman council onsite administrative assessments.
- 400.0075 - Complaint notification and resolution procedures.
- 400.0078 - Citizen access to State Long-Term Care Ombudsman Program services.
- 400.0079 - Immunity.
- 400.0081 - Access to facilities, residents, and records.
- 400.0083 - Interference; retaliation; penalties.
- 400.0087 - Department oversight; funding.
- 400.0089 - Complaint data reports.
- 400.0091 - Training.
- 400.021 - Definitions.
- 400.022 - Residents’ rights.
- 400.0255 - Resident transfer or discharge; requirements and procedures; hearings.
- 400.162 - Property and personal affairs of residents.
- 400.19 - Right of entry and inspection.
- 400.23 - Rules; evaluation and deficiencies; licensure status.
- 400.235 - Nursing home quality and licensure status; Gold Seal Program.
- 415.102 - Definitions of terms used in ss. 415.101-415.113.
- 415.1034 - Mandatory reporting of abuse, neglect, or exploitation of vulnerable adults; mandatory reports of death.
- 415.104 - Protective investigations of cases of abuse, neglect, or exploitation of vulnerable adults; transmittal of records to state attorney.
- 415.1055 - Notification to administrative entities.
- 415.106 - Cooperation by the department and criminal justice and other agencies.
- 415.107 - Confidentiality of reports and records.
- 429.02 - Definitions.
- 429.19 - Violations; imposition of administrative fines; grounds.
- 429.26 - Appropriateness of placements; examinations of residents.
- 429.28 - Resident bill of rights.
- 429.34 - Right of entry and inspection.
- 429.35 - Maintenance of records; reports.
- 429.67 - Licensure.
- 429.85 - Residents’ bill of rights.
- 400.191 - Availability, distribution, and posting of reports and records.
+ − Votes (5)
June 24, 2015: Floor vote: S 7018 pb
- Yeas: 5
June 24, 2015: Floor vote: S 7018 Filed
- Yeas: 8
June 24, 2015: Floor vote: S 7018 Filed
- Yeas: 17
April 24, 2015: Floor vote: S 7018 e1
- Yeas: 117
April 22, 2015: Floor vote: S 7018 e1
- Yeas: 40
+ − Sponsor
Appropriations
Type:
Primary Sponsor