+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On February 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5007 (Ch. 2018-12)
- Substituted HB 5007
- Read 3rd time
On February 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on 3rd reading
- Read 2nd time
On February 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/07/18
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
On January 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- Favorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 19 NAYS 0
On January 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/01/18, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building --Meeting cancelled
On January 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 01/31/18, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
On January 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced
- Referred to Appropriations
On January 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Filed
On January 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Submitted as Committee Bill and Reported Favorably by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
On January 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 01/10/18, 9:00 am, 401 Senate Office Building
- Submitted for consideration by Governmental Oversight and Accountability
+ − Analyses (4)
+ − Statute Amended
- 121.71 - Uniform rates; process; calculations; levy.
+ − Votes (2)
May 3, 2018: Floor vote: S 7014 pb
- Yeas: 6
May 3, 2018: Floor vote: S 7014 Filed
- Yeas: 19
+ − Sponsor
Governmental Oversight and Accountability
Type:
Primary Sponsor