+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On April 22, 2021 in the House:
- In Messages
On April 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 1
- Read 3rd time
- Read 2nd time
On April 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/22/21
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
- Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 15 NAYS 0
On April 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/20/21, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building
On March 31, 2021 in the Senate:
- Now in Rules
- Favorable by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
On March 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 03/31/21, 8:00 am, 37 Senate Building
On March 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On February 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules
On February 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed
On February 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Submitted as Committee Bill and Reported Favorably by Environment and Natural Resources; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
On January 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Environment and Natural Resources, 02/01/21, 2:30 pm, 37 Senate Building
- Submitted for consideration by Environment and Natural Resources
+ − Analyses (6)
+ − Statute Amended
- 403.73 - Trade secrets; confidentiality.
+ − Votes (4)
April 29, 2021: Floor vote: S 7006 pb
- Yeas: 5
April 29, 2021: Floor vote: S 7006 Filed
- Yeas: 5
April 29, 2021: Floor vote: S 7006 Filed
- Yeas: 15
April 22, 2021: Floor vote: S 7006 Filed
- Yeas: 39
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsor
Environment and Natural Resources
Type:
Primary Sponsor