+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7009 (Ch. 2019-28), CS/CS/CS/SB 248 (Ch. 2019-12)
- Substituted HB 7009
- Read 3rd time
On March 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on 3rd reading
- Read 2nd time
On March 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/21/19
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
- Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
On March 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Rules, 03/13/19, 10:00 am, 110 Senate Building
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On February 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Now in Rules
On February 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Favorable by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 4 NAYS 0
On February 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 02/12/19, 4:00 pm, 301 Senate Building
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules
On January 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed
On January 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Submitted as Committee Bill and Reported Favorably by Health Policy; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
On December 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 01/07/19, 2:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
- Submitted for consideration by Health Policy
+ − Analyses (6)
+ − Statute Amended
- 119.071 - General exemptions from inspection or copying of public records.
+ − Votes (3)
July 18, 2019: Floor vote: S 7004 pb
- Yeas: 10
July 18, 2019: Floor vote: S 7004 Filed
- Yeas: 4
July 18, 2019: Floor vote: S 7004 Filed
- Yeas: 17
+ − Sponsor
Health Policy
Type:
Primary Sponsor