+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On February 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7029 (Ch. 2018-39)
- Substituted HB 7029
- Read 2nd time
On February 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/21/18
On January 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
- Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 13 NAYS 0
On January 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Rules, 01/18/18, 1:30 pm, 110 Senate Office Building
On January 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Now in Rules
On January 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Favorable by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
On January 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On January 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 01/10/18, 9:00 am, 401 Senate Office Building
On December 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules
On November 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Filed
On November 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Submitted as Committee Bill and Reported Favorably by Criminal Justice; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
On November 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 11/13/17, 4:00 pm, 37 Senate Office Building
On October 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 10/23/17, 4:00 pm, 37 Senate Office Building --Not Considered
On October 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Submitted for consideration by Criminal Justice
+ − Analyses (6)
+ − Statute Amended
- 943.0583 - Human trafficking victim expunction.
+ − Votes (3)
May 3, 2018: Floor vote: S 7000 pb
- Yeas: 6
May 3, 2018: Floor vote: S 7000 Filed
- Yeas: 6
May 3, 2018: Floor vote: S 7000 Filed
- Yeas: 13
+ − Sponsor
Criminal Justice
Type:
Primary Sponsor