+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On February 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by Officers and filed with Secretary of State
On February 9, 2022 in the House:
- Adopted
- Read 2nd time
- Substituted for HM 63
On February 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Ordered enrolled
On February 3, 2022 in the House:
- 1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
- Bill added to Special Order Calendar (2/9/2022)
- Bill referred to House Calendar
On January 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- Adopted
- Read 2nd time
- Immediately certified
On January 27, 2022 in the House:
- In Messages
On January 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 01/27/22
On January 13, 2022 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
- Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 16 NAYS 0
On January 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On January 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Rules, 01/13/22, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
On December 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Now in Rules
On November 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Favorable by Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
On November 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security, 11/30/21, 3:30 pm, 37 Senate Building
On October 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; Rules
On September 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (4)
+ − Votes (2)
July 18, 2022: Floor vote: S 302 Filed
- Yeas: 6
July 18, 2022: Floor vote: S 302 Filed
- Yeas: 16