+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On February 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5103 (Ch. 2016-25), CS/CS/HB 941 (Ch. 2016-230), HB 5001 (Ch. 2016-66)
- Substituted HB 5103
- Read 3rd time
On February 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on 3rd reading
- Read 2nd time
On February 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On February 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/10/16
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
- Filed
On January 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/03/16, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building -- Submitted as Committee Bill; YEAS 19 NAYS 0
- Submitted for consideration by Appropriations
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Statute Amended
- 381.82 - Ed and Ethel Moore Alzheimer’s Disease Research Program.
+ − Vote
October 10, 2017: Floor vote: S 2510 pb
- Yeas: 19
+ − Sponsor
Appropriations
Type:
Primary Sponsor