+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (37)
On June 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Chapter No. 2017-127, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2510 (Ch. 2017-128), SB 2500 (Ch. 2017-70)
On June 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor
On June 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
On May 8, 2017 in the House:
- In returning messages
On May 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Report received
- Passed as amended by Conference Committee Report; YEAS 37 NAYS 0
- Conference Committee Report adopted (712492)
On May 8, 2017 in the House:
- Conference Committee Report considered
- Conference Committee Report adopted (712492)
- Passed as amended by Conference Committee Report; YEAS 110 NAYS 2
On May 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ordered engrossed, then enrolled
On April 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee appointed: Appropriations Conference Committee: Latvala (Chair), Flores (Vice Chair), Baxley (At Large), Benacquisto (At Large), Bradley (At Large), Braynon (At Large), Clemens (At Large), Galvano (At Large), Grimsley (At Large), Montford (At Large), Simpson (At Large); Appropriations Conference Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice/Justice: Bean (Chair), Baxley, Bracy, Clemens, Perry; Appropriations Conference Committee on General Government/Governmental Operations and Technology: Grimsley (Chair), Bean, Broxson, Campbell, Garcia, Mayfield, Rodriguez, Rouson, Torres; Appropriations Conference Committee on Health and Human Services/Health Care: Flores (Chair), Baxley, Book, Passidomo, Powell, Rader, Stargel; Appropriations Conference Committee on Higher Education/Higher Education: Galvano (Chair), Bradley, Clemens, Farmer, Lee, Simmons; Appropriations Conference Committee on Pre-K - 12 Education/Pre K - 12 Education: Simmons (Chair), Broxson, Farmer, Grimsley, Lee, Montford, Rouson, Young; Appropriations Conference Committee on the Environment and Natural Resources/Agriculture and Natural Resources: Bradley (Chair), Book, Braynon, Hutson, Latvala, Mayfield, Stewart; Appropriations Conference Committee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development/Transportation and Tourism: Brandes (Chair), Benacquisto, Gainer, Gibson, Passidomo, Powell, Rader, Simpson, Thurston
On April 27, 2017 in the House:
- Conference Committee appointed: Appropriations Conference Committee: Representatives Trujillo (Chair), Moraitis (At Large), Berman (At Large), Bileca (At Large), Boyd (At Large), Caldwell (At Large), Cruz (At Large), Cummings (At Large), Diaz, J. (At Large), DuBose (At Large), McGhee (At Large), Metz (At Large), Moskowitz (At Large), Nunez (At Large), Oliva (At Large), Sprowls (At Large), Stafford (At Large), Stark (At Large)
- Bill placed in Conference (Appropriations Conference Committee)
On April 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Bill placed in Conference (Appropriations Conference Committee)
On April 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- In returning messages
On April 13, 2017 in the House:
- Read 2nd time
- Amendment(s) adopted (414319)
- Passed as amended; YEAS 113 NAYS 0
- Read 3rd time
- Passed the Senate bill as amended by the House and we accede to conference
- Immediately certified
On April 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- The Senate requests that the House pass the bill as passed by the Senate or agree to include the bill in the Budget Conference
- Read 2nd time
- Passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0
- Read 3rd time
- Immediately certified
On April 12, 2017 in the House:
- In Messages
- Referred to Calendar
- Received
On April 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/12/17
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
- Filed
On April 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Submitted as Committee Bill and Reported Favorably by Appropriations; YEAS 18 NAYS 0
On March 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/05/17, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building
On March 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Submitted for consideration by Appropriations
+ − Analyses (4)
+ − Amendments (2)
712492 - Conference Committee Amendment
Delete everything after the enacting clause and insert:
414319 - Strike All Amendment
Remove everything after the enacting clause and insert:
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (5)
October 10, 2017: Floor vote: S 2508 pb
- Yeas: 18
May 8, 2017: Floor vote: S 2508
- Yeas: 110
- Nays: 2
May 8, 2017: Floor vote: S 2508
- Yeas: 37
April 13, 2017: Floor vote: S 2508
- Yeas: 113
April 12, 2017: Floor vote: S 2508
- Yeas: 39
+ − Sponsor
Appropriations
Type:
Primary Sponsor