+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On May 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Died in Judiciary
- Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On December 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 01/10/17, 2:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building --Meeting cancelled
On December 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Judiciary; Rules
On December 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor