+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On May 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by Officers and filed with Secretary of State, companion bill(s) passed, see HR 8015 (Adopted)
On April 19, 2017 in the House:
- CS adopted
- Read 2nd time
- Substituted for CS/HM 935
On April 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ordered enrolled
On April 18, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/19/17
On April 13, 2017 in the House:
- Received
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/18/17
- Referred to Calendar
- In Messages
On April 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- CS adopted
- Read 2nd time
On April 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- CS/CS by Rules read 1st time
On April 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/12/17
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
On April 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- CS/CS by- Rules; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
On April 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/06/17, 10:30 am, 110 Senate Office Building
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- CS by Commerce and Tourism read 1st time
- Now in Rules
On March 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
- CS by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
On March 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 03/27/17, 1:30 pm, 110 Senate Office Building
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On February 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Commerce and Tourism; Rules
On January 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (4)
+ − Amendments (2)
381644 - Amendment
Delete line 126 and insert:
396826 - Amendment (Delete All)
Delete everything after the resolving clause and insert:
+ − Votes (2)
October 10, 2017: Floor vote: S 572 Filed
- Yeas: 8
October 10, 2017: Floor vote: S 572 c1
- Yeas: 12
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor