+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HJR 275 (Passed), CS/HB 277 (Ch. 2016-121)
- Substituted CS/HJR 275
- Read 2nd time
On March 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/08/16
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
On March 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Favorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 03/01/16, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building
On January 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- CS by Finance and Tax read 1st time
- Now in Appropriations
On January 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On January 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- CS by Finance and Tax; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
On January 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Finance and Tax, 01/25/16, 1:00 pm, 401 Senate Office Building
On January 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On November 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Now in Finance and Tax
On November 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Favorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
On November 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 11/17/15, 1:00 pm, 301 Senate Office Building
On October 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Community Affairs; Finance and Tax; Appropriations
On October 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (6)
+ − Amendment
915198 - Amendment (Delete All)
Delete everything after the resolving clause and insert:
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- Article VII - Section 6
- Article XII -
+ − Votes (3)
October 10, 2017: Floor vote: S 492 Filed
- Yeas: 7
October 10, 2017: Floor vote: S 492 Filed
- Yeas: 7
October 10, 2017: Floor vote: S 492 c1
- Yeas: 17
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor