+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On March 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Finance and Tax
- Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
On January 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On December 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Finance and Tax
- Favorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
On November 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 12/05/17, 10:00 am, 301 Senate Office Building
On October 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Community Affairs; Appropriations Subcommittee on Finance and Tax; Appropriations
On October 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- Article VII - Section 4
- Article XII -
+ − Vote
April 4, 2018: Floor vote: S 452 Filed
- Yeas: 6
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor