+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On March 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- Died on Calendar
- Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
On February 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
On February 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 16 NAYS 0
On February 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/12/20, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
On January 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On December 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Now in Rules
- Favorable by Ethics and Elections; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
On December 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Ethics and Elections, 12/09/19, 4:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
On November 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Now in Ethics and Elections
On November 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Favorable by Judiciary; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
On October 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 11/05/19, 2:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
On October 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Judiciary; Ethics and Elections; Rules
On September 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (6)
+ − Votes (3)
November 17, 2020: Floor vote: S 396 Filed
- Yeas: 6
November 17, 2020: Floor vote: S 396 Filed
- Yeas: 6
November 17, 2020: Floor vote: S 396 Filed
- Yeas: 16
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor