+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On March 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Died in Education
- Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
On February 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- CS by Ethics and Elections read 1st time
- Now in Education
- Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On January 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- CS by Ethics and Elections; YEAS 4 NAYS 2
On January 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Ethics and Elections, 01/30/18, 2:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
On January 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On August 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ethics and Elections; Education; Rules
On August 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Amendments (2)
438760 - Amendment to Amendment (834136)
Delete line 29 and insert:
834136 - Amendment (Delete All)
Delete everything after the resolving clause and insert:
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- Article IX - Section 4
- Article XII -
+ − Vote
April 4, 2018: Floor vote: S 194 Filed
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor