+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On May 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Finance and Tax, companion bill(s) passed, see HJR 7105 (Passed), HB 7107 (Ch. 2017-35)
- Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
On March 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Finance and Tax
On March 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Favorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 5 NAYS 1
On March 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 03/22/17, 1:30 pm, 301 Senate Office Building
On March 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On March 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Community Affairs; Appropriations Subcommittee on Finance and Tax; Appropriations
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- Article VII - Section 6
- Article XII -
+ − Vote
October 10, 2017: Floor vote: S 1774 Filed
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor