+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On May 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by Officers and filed with Secretary of State
On April 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Ordered enrolled
On April 30, 2014 in the House:
- CS passed; YEAS 74 NAYS 45
- Read 3rd time
On April 29, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on 3rd reading
- Read 2nd time
On April 28, 2014 in the House:
- Received
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/29/14
- Referred to Calendar
On April 11, 2014 in the House:
- In Messages
On April 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- CS passed; YEAS 26 NAYS 14
- Read 3rd time
On March 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on 3rd reading
On March 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- CS by Rules read 1st time
On March 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/26/14
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
- Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On March 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- CS by- Rules; YEAS 10 NAYS 5
On March 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Rules, 03/20/14, 10:30 am, 110 Senate Office Building
On March 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Now in Rules
On March 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Amendments)
On March 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Favorable with 1 amendment(s) by Judiciary (147730); YEAS 5 NAYS 3
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 03/11/14, 1:30 pm, 110 Senate Office Building
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On February 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Judiciary; Rules
On February 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Amendment
147730 - Amendment
In ballot statement, delete lines 127 - 135 and insert:
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (6)
November 5, 2014: Floor vote: S 1188 Filed
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 3
November 5, 2014: Floor vote: S 1188 Filed
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 5
April 30, 2014: Floor vote: S 1188 c1
- Yeas: 112
April 30, 2014: Floor vote: S 1188 c1
- Yeas: 119
April 30, 2014: Floor vote: S 1188 c1
- Yeas: 74
- Nays: 45
April 3, 2014: Floor vote: S 1188 c1
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 14
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor