+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On April 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HCR 631 (Adopted)
- Substituted CS/HCR 631
- Read 2nd time
On April 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/27/17
On April 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- CS by Rules read 1st time
On April 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
- Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On April 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- CS by- Rules; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
On April 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/12/17, 5:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building
On March 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Now in Rules
On March 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Favorable by Judiciary; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
On March 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 03/22/17, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Now in Judiciary
- Introduced
On March 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Favorable by Criminal Justice; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
On February 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 03/06/17, 1:30 pm, 37 Senate Office Building
On February 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Criminal Justice; Judiciary; Rules
On February 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (6)
+ − Amendment
976966 - Amendment (Delete All)
Delete everything after the resolving clause and insert:
+ − Votes (4)
October 10, 2017: Floor vote: S 920 Filed
- Yeas: 7
October 10, 2017: Floor vote: S 920 Filed
- Yeas: 7
October 10, 2017: Floor vote: S 920 Filed
- Yeas: 12
April 27, 2017: Floor vote: S 920 c1
- Yeas: 36
+ − Sponsors (39)
Type:
Primary Sponsor