+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On May 5, 2017 in the House:
- Died in Messages
- Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
On April 27, 2017 in the House:
- In Messages
On April 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Adopted
- Read 2nd time
On April 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/27/17
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
On April 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
On April 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/25/17, 2:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building
On April 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Now in Rules
- Favorable by Appropriations; YEAS 18 NAYS 0
On April 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/13/17, 9:30 am, 412 Knott Building
On March 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced
- Referred to Appropriations; Rules
On March 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (4)
+ − Votes (2)
October 10, 2017: Floor vote: S 1360 Filed
- Yeas: 18
October 10, 2017: Floor vote: S 1360 Filed
- Yeas: 10
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor