+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (34)
On April 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Chapter No. 2022-34
On April 6, 2022 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor
On April 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
On March 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Ordered enrolled
On March 9, 2022 in the House:
- CS passed; YEAS 115, NAYS 2
- Read 3rd time
On March 8, 2022 in the House:
- Added to Third Reading Calendar
- Placed on 3rd reading
- Read 2nd time
On March 7, 2022 in the House:
- Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/8/2022)
- Bill referred to House Calendar
- 1st Reading (Engrossed 1)
On March 4, 2022 in the House:
- In Messages
On March 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- CS passed as amended; YEAS 37 NAYS 0
- Read 3rd time
- Amendment(s) adopted (826924)
- Read 2nd time
On March 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
- CS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/04/22
On February 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- CS/CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 18 NAYS 0
On February 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/28/22, 10:30 am, 412 Knott Building
On February 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Now in Appropriations
- Subcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
On January 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services, 02/02/22, 2:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
On January 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- CS by Health Policy read 1st time
- Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services
- Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On January 13, 2022 in the Senate:
- CS by Health Policy; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
On January 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On January 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 01/13/22, 11:00 am, 412 Knott Building
On December 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Health Policy; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations
On November 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (6)
+ − Amendments (3)
870518 - Amendment (Replaced by Committee Substitute 1/13/2022)
Delete lines 68 - 74 and insert:
799882 - Amendment (Delete All) (Replaced by Committee Substitute 3/2/2022)
Delete everything after the enacting clause and insert:
826924 - Amendment (Delete All) (Senate: Adopted 3/4/2022)
Delete everything after the enacting clause and insert:
+ − Statute Amended
- 408.823 -
+ − Votes (5)
July 20, 2022: Floor vote: S 988 Filed
- Yeas: 7
July 20, 2022: Floor vote: S 988 c1
- Yeas: 11
July 20, 2022: Floor vote: S 988 c1
- Yeas: 18
March 9, 2022: Floor vote: S 988 e1
- Yeas: 115
- Nays: 2
March 4, 2022: Floor vote: S 988 c2
- Yeas: 37