+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (20)
On April 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1057 (Ch. 2019-92)
- Substituted CS/HB 1057
- Read 2nd time
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/26/19
On April 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- CS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time
On April 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
- Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- CS/CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 19 NAYS 0
On April 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/11/19, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
- Now in Appropriations
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee Recommendation: CS/CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
On April 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development, 04/04/19, 12:30 pm, 110 Senate Building
On March 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- CS by Infrastructure and Security read 1st time
- Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On March 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- CS by Infrastructure and Security; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Infrastructure and Security, 03/12/19, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On February 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Infrastructure and Security; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations
On February 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (6)
+ − Amendments (5)
591536 - Amendment
Between lines 48 and 49 insert:
840786 - Amendment
Delete lines 248 - 286 and insert:
683772 - Amendment
Delete line 46 and insert:
580332 - Amendment
Delete lines 136 - 141 and insert:
825644 - Amendment
Delete lines 71 - 104 and insert:
+ − Statutes Amended (6)
- 319.30 - Definitions; dismantling, destruction, change of identity of motor vehicle or mobile home; salvage.
- 320.03 - Registration; duties of tax collectors; International Registration Plan.
- 316.224 - Color of clearance lamps, identification lamps, side marker lamps, backup lamps, reflectors, and deceleration lights.
- 316.235 - Additional lighting equipment.
- 316.2397 - Certain lights prohibited; exceptions.
- 316.2398 - Display or use of red warning signals; motor vehicles of volunteer firefighters or medical staff.
+ − Votes (3)
July 18, 2019: Floor vote: S 974 Filed
- Yeas: 8
July 18, 2019: Floor vote: S 974 c1
- Yeas: 7
July 18, 2019: Floor vote: S 974 c1
- Yeas: 19
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor