+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 967 (Ch. 2016-93)
- Substituted HB 967
- Read 2nd time
On February 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/02/16
On January 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
On January 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 13 NAYS 0
On January 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Rules, 01/20/16, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building
On January 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Now in Rules
On January 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Favorable by Judiciary; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
- Introduced
On January 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 01/12/16, 3:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building
On December 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Judiciary; Rules
On November 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (4)
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
+ − Votes (2)
October 10, 2017: Floor vote: S 972 Filed
- Yeas: 10
October 10, 2017: Floor vote: S 972 Filed
- Yeas: 13
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor